+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/18
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 26 SLA 18
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 3:05 PM 6/13/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 340
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 340
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2018
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: COSTELLO, STEVENS, MEYER, GARDNER
- L&C RPT 4DP
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- VERSION: HB 340
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 340
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: BIRCH, KNOPP
- DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KITO
- L&C RPT 5DP 2NR
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor