+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- HELD ON SECRETARY'S DESK
- RULES TO 3RD SUP CALENDAR 4/15/12
On April 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: PASKVAN, WIELECHOWSKI
- DP: WAGONER, FRENCH
- RES RPT 2DP 2NR
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, DYSON
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 340
- PASSED Y36 N1 E1 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 340
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/26 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2012
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- NR: MUNOZ
- DNP: GARDNER
- DP: DICK, FOSTER, SEATON, FEIGE
- RES RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS