+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 26, 2004 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/23 CHAPTER 25 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/04
On April 8, 2004 in the House:
- 9:18 AM 4/8/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 340(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 340(JUD) AM
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, OGAN;
- NR: FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 3NR
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS; NR: DAVIS, FRENCH,
- STEVENS G
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 340(JUD) AM
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 340(JUD) AM
- PASSED Y37 N1 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/18/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/19 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
- DP: OGG, SAMUELS, HOLM, ANDERSON,
- MCGUIRE; NR: GARA
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 1DP 4NR
- DP: ANDERSON; NR: CRAWFORD, LYNN,
- GATTO, GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On January 16, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/2/04)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD