+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (55)
On August 31, 2021 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/26/21
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/28 CHAPTER 30 SLA 21
On August 23, 2021 in the House:
- 12:35 P.M. 8/23/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- FN1: (DOT)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 7DP
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF
- FN1: (DOT)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 34
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN
- PASSED Y20 N-
- HUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 34
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, BEGICH, VON IMHOF
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER TRA
- FN1: (DOT)
- DP: MYERS, MICCICHE, KIEHL, SHOWER
- TRA RPT 4DP
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REVAK, SHOWER, STEVENS, HOLLAND, WIELECHOWSKI,
- GRAY-JACKSON, WILSON, COSTELLO, MYERS, REINBOLD, KAWASAKI, STEDMAN, BISHOP,
- MICCICHE
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN RPT 9DP
- MERRICK
- FN1: (DOT)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2021
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN,
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- PASSED Y36 N2 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, STORY, PATKOTAK, SPOHNHOLZ, NELSON, SCHRAGE, VANCE,
- KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR, WOOL, CRONK, KAUFMAN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 34
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 34
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, MERRICK, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, RASMUSSEN
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- MLV RPT 6DP
- COSPONSOR(S): TILTON, TUCK
- DP: CLAMAN, TARR, NELSON, STORY, SHAW, TUCK
- FN1: (DOT)
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- FIN REPLACES STA REFERRAL
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor