+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/15/19
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/17 CHAPTER 3 SLA 19
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- 5:25 P.M. 5/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 34
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2019
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 34
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEDMAN, STEVENS, COSTELLO, KIEHL
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DP: HUGHES, SHOWER, WILSON, KIEHL
- TRA RPT 4DP
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BISHOP, COGHILL, MICCICHE, KAWASAKI, HUGHES
- TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- VERSION: HB 34
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 34
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, JACKSON, TILTON, RAUSCHER, THOMPSON
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOPP
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DP: STORY, RASMUSSEN, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, TALERICO, WOOL, STUTES
- TRA RPT 7DP
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SHAW
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- DP: VANCE, LEDOUX, SHAW, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS, FIELDS
- STA RPT 6DP
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- STA, TRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor