+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 1:55 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/14 CHAPTER 57 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/12/04
On May 9, 2004 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E2 A3
- RESCIND CONCUR MOTION WITHDRAWN
- GARA NOTICE OF RECON OUT OF ORDER
- RESCIND CONCUR FAILED Y11 N23 E2 A4
On May 8, 2004 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 339(JUD)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELTON, ELLIS, FRENCH,
- DYSON, STEVENS G, BUNDE, COWDERY, OLSON
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 339(JUD)
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT SCS 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS; NR: OGAN, THERRIAULT
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 4DP
- DP: BUNDE, FRENCH, SEEKINS, STEVENS G
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On April 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
On April 7, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 339(JUD)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, SEATON, LYNN,
- CRAWFORD
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 339(JUD)
On April 5, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): WOLF
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP
- DP: HOLM, GARA, GRUENBERG, OGG, MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLM, MCGUIRE
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 4DP 2NR 1AM
- DP: CRAWFORD, LYNN, DAHLSTROM,
- ANDERSON; NR: GATTO, ROKEBERG;
- AM: GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/2/04)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, JUD
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor