+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- 10:05AM 5/25/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/1 CHAPTER 102 SLA 00
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/30/00
On May 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
On May 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/2/00
On April 30, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 5/1/00
On April 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/30/00
On April 28, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/29/00
On April 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/28/00
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CAL AND 1 OR 4/26/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 339(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N2
- MACKIE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 4NR
- DP: TORGERSON, PHILLIPS, PETE KELLY,
- LEMAN; NR: GREEN, ADAMS, DONLEY, WILKEN
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
On April 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 1DP 4NR
- NR: MACKIE, TIM KELLY, DONLEY, LEMAN;
- DP: HOFFMAN
- HOUSE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
On April 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On April 11, 2000 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 10, 2000 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 339(FIN)
- PASSED Y24 N14 E2
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 8, 2000 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/00
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
On April 5, 2000 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 1DNP 4NR
- DP: MULDER, AUSTERMAN, GRUSSENDORF,
- MOSES, DAVIES, FOSTER; DNP: WILLIAMS;
- NR: THERRIAULT, BUNDE, DAVIS, PHILLIPS
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED) 4/3/00
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 2DNP 2NR 1AM
- DNP: MURKOWSKI, ROKEBERG; NR: HARRIS,
- CISSNA; AM: HALCRO
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DCED)
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN