+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY
On April 28, 1994 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 337(JUD)
- PASSED Y38 N- A2
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 5DP 1NR
- DP: GREEN, PORTER, PHILLIPS, NORDLUND
- DP: DAVIDSON
- NR: KOTT
- -3 PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (CORR,DPS,LAW) 3/4
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TOOHEY
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) NEW TITLE 4DP 4NR
- DP: G.DAVIS, TOOHEY, NICHOLIA, BRICE
- NR: VEZEY, KOTT, BUNDE, OLBERG
- -3 ZERO FNS (LAW,DPS,CORR) 3/4/94
- COSPONSOR(S): G. DAVIS
On January 18, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA
On January 14, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On January 13, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): B. DAVIS
On January 10, 1994 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, JUDICIARY
On January 3, 1994 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor