+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (64)
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 3:04 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 68 SLA 04
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/14/04
On May 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COWDERY, GUESS,
- ELLIS, LINCOLN, ELTON, FRENCH, SEEKINS,
- OGAN, HOFFMAN, STEVENS B
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 337(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- BUNDE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 337(FIN)
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BUNDE, WILKEN,
- STEDMAN, DYSON, STEVENS G, WAGONER,
- DAVIS, OLSON
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON, OLSON,
- BUNDE, STEVENS B; NR: HOFFMAN
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: (ADM)
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 3DP 1AM
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN;
- AM: GUESS
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: (ADM)
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, FIN
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 337(FIN)
- PASSED Y37 E1 A2
- COSPONSOR(S): KOOKESH, CISSNA,
- STEPOVICH, LYNN, CROFT, CRAWFORD
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 337(FIN)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, STOLTZE, MOSES,
- CHENAULT, FATE, FOSTER, HARRIS,
- WILLIAMS
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- FN2: (ADM)
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, HAWKER
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 4DP
- DP: GATTO, WOLF, SEATON, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SAMUELS
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 6DP 1NR
- DP: GRUENBERG, SEATON, HOLM, LYNN,
- BERKOWITZ, WEYHRAUCH; NR: COGHILL
- FN1: ZERO(HSS)
- COSPONSOR(S): KAPSNER, MEYER
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, HOLM
On January 16, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GATTO, SEATON, WILSON,
- KERTTULA, HEINZE, ANDERSON
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/2/04)
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, HES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor