+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN3: (CED)
- FN2: (CED)
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: LYNN, KOTT, LEDOUX, ANDERSON
- DNP: ROKEBERG;
- DP: CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG;
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 1DNP 4NR
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARA
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAPSNER
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS, KERTTULA
On January 9, 2006 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/05