+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/27/04
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 131 SLA 04
On June 21, 2004 in the House:
- 3:04 PM 6/10/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 334(RLS)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- THERRIAULT
- FRENCH, ELTON, STEVENS G, ELLIS,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILKEN, OLSON, OGAN,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 334(RLS)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2004
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- DP: SEEKINS, OGAN, FRENCH, THERRIAULT
- JUD RPT 4DP
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: GUESS
- DP: STEVENS G, COWDERY, STEDMAN;
- STA RPT 3DP 1NR
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- BUNDE, DAVIS
- SEEKINS, WAGONER, STEDMAN, COWDERY,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, LINCOLN,
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 19, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2004
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 2DP 4NR
- DP: COGHILL, ROKEGERG; NR: BERKOWITZ,
- VERSION: CSHB 334(RLS)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- MORGAN, KERTTULA, MCGUIRE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 334(RLS)
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- COSPONSOR(S): MASEK, LYNN, DAHLSTROM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, WOLF
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- DP: SAMUELS, HOLM, ANDERSON, OGG,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1NR 1AM
- FN3: ZERO(LAW)
- MCGUIRE; NR: GARA; AM: GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- FN2: ZERO(COR)
On January 12, 2004 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/2/04)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor