+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On July 24, 2008 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/21/08
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/23 CHAPTER 117 SLA 08
On July 9, 2008 in the House:
- 10:50 AM 7/3/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 332(FIN)(TITLE AM)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 332(FIN)(TITLE AM)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/12/2008
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, ELTON, THOMAS, HUGGINS
- NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
- FN1: ZERO (EED)
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO (EED)
- NR: DYSON, COWDERY
- DP: DAVIS, ELTON
- HES RPT 2DP 2NR
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- AM NO 1 (TITLE AM) ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2
- VERSION: CSHB 332(FIN)(TITLE AM)
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, KERTTULA
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 332(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2008
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DOLL
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- NR: HAWKER, KELLY, STOLTZE, CHENAULT
- DP: CRAWFORD, JOULE, THOMAS, GARA
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 4NR
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- DP: CISSNA, SEATON, ROSES, KELLER, WILSON
- HES RPT 5DP
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS