+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN3: ZERO(H.FIN/DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- NR: JOULE
- DP: STOLTZE, KERTTULA, HAWKER, FOSTER, WEYHRAUCH, KELLY, HOLM, MEYER;
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) NT 8DP 1NR
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, MEYER, HAWKER, KERTTULA, STOLTZE, HOLM, KELLY
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ANDERSON, KOTT, CRAWFORD, GUTTENBERG, LEDOUX
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(MVA)
- DP: CRAWFORD, LYNN, KOTT, LEDOUX, GUTTENBERG, ROKEBERG, ANDERSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 7DP
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On January 9, 2006 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/05
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor