+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD
On May 12, 1999 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y28 N12
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 11, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 33(JUD)
- PASSED Y39 1A
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On April 30, 1999 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 1NR
- DP: KOTT, JAMES, GREEN; NR: CROFT
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.JUD)
On April 29, 1999 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN, JAMES, KOTT
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/99
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD