+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 30, 2000 in the House:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- DNP: KEMPLEN; NR: MORGAN
- DP: GREEN, DYSON, WHITAKER, COGHILL;
- HES RPT CS(HES) 4DP 1DNP 1NR
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- HES, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, OGAN
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- HES, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS