+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 28, 2006 in the House:
- WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
On April 27, 2006 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2006
- AM NO 3 BEFORE THE HOUSE
- AM NO 3 WITHDRAWN AND REOFFERED
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y33 N6 E1
- AM NOS 4 - 6 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR
- COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On April 26, 2006 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2006
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y16 N16 E2 A6
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- COSPONSOR(S): LYNN
On April 21, 2006 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On April 20, 2006 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 1DP 7NR 2AM
- DP: FOSTER;
- NR: WEYHRAUCH, HOLM, KELLY, MOSES, JOULE, MEYER, CHENAULT;
- AM: HAWKER, KERTTULA
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- FN4: ZERO(ADM)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(DPS)
- FN6: (LAW)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: GARA, WILSON, KOTT, GRUENBERG;
- NR: COGHILL
- AM: MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On January 9, 2006 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 12/30/05
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN