+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 14, 2000 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 5/25/00
- 10:40 AM 5/9/00 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/24 CHAPTER 85 SLA 00
On April 26, 2000 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 26, 2000 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On April 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/26/00
On April 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- MACKIE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 325(FIN)
On April 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/00
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On April 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- ADAMS, WILKEN, LEMAN
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL, PHILLIPS,
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
On April 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 12, 2000 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/00
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 325(JUD)
- PASSED Y36 N1 A3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 5, 2000 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 2/2/00
- PHILLIPS; NR: MULDER, AUSTERMAN, DAVIS
- GRUSSENDORF, MOSES, WILLIAMS, FOSTER,
- DP: THERRIAULT, BUNDE, DAVIES,
- FIN RPT CS(JUD) 8DP 3NR
On March 29, 2000 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5NR
- KERTTULA
- NR: MURKOWSKI, CROFT, GREEN, KOTT,
- FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 2/2/00
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 2/2/00
- COGHILL, BRICE, KEMPLEN
- DP: GREEN, DYSON; NR: WHITAKER,
- HES RPT CS(HES) 2DP 4NR
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FISCAL NOTE (DHSS)
- HES, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor