+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (136)
On July 20, 1998 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR
On July 15, 1998 in the House:
- W/ LINE ITEM VETOES
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 137 SLA 98
- 8:30 AM 6/8/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/98
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADPT Y20 N-
- CC REPORT ADPT Y13 N6 A1 CCS HB 325
- CONSTITUTIONAL BRF FLD Y14 N6
On May 12, 1998 in the House:
- CC REPORT ADPT Y29 N11 CCS HB 325
- BRF ART IX SEC 17(C), SEC 7 FLD Y27 N13
- BRF ART IX SEC 17(C) SEC 32 PD Y36 N4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On May 11, 1998 in the House:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT READ
On May 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT READ
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- H LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On May 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- S LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
On April 30, 1998 in the House:
- *HANLEY,THERRIAULT,GRUSSENDORF
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y1 N36 A3
On April 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 E1
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- *PEARCE,SHARP,ADAMS
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- AM NO 16 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 15 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 14 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 13 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 12 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 11 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 7 ADOPTED Y15 N5
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 6 ADOPTED Y15 N5
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 18 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 17 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 30 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 19 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 32 FAILED Y5 N15
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- BUDGET RESERVE FUND ADOPTED Y15 N5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y15 N5
- READ THE 3RD TIME SCS CSHB 325(FIN)AM S
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 34 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 33 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 31 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 20 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 29 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 28 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 27 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 26 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 25 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 24 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 23 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 22 FAILED Y6 N14
- AM NO 21 FAILED Y5 N15
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/98
On April 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR TECHNICAL TITLE CHG
- DP: PEARCE, SHARP, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- TORGERSON, DONLEY; NR: ADAMS
On April 24, 1998 in the House:
- JOURNAL CORRECTION
On April 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- PASSED Y27 N12 E1
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 43 FLD Y2 N36 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 325(FIN) AM
- BRF SEC 31, PG 47, LINE 4 FLD Y27 N12 E1
- BRFSEC 6,PG 3,LINES 11-22 FLD Y27 N12 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AM NO 19 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1
- AM NO 18 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1
- AM NO 17 FAILED Y10 N27 E1 A2
- AM NO 16 FAILED Y10 N26 E1 A3
- AM NO 15 FAILED Y11 N26 E1 A2
- AM NO 14 FAILED Y11 N26 E1 A2
- AM NO 13 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1
- AM NO 12 FAILED Y11 N26 E1 A2
- AM NO 11 FAILED Y11 N24 E1 A4
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y10 N28 E1 A1
- AM NO 8 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y10 N22 E1 A7
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y8 N22 E1 A9
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y9 N21 E1 A9
- AM NO 21 FAILED Y11 N25 E1 A3
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y14 N26
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/98
- AM NO 20 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1
- AM NO 25 FAILED Y11 N24 E1 A4
- AM NO 22 FAILED Y10 N24 E1 A5
- AM NO 37 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/22 CALENDAR
- AM NO 45 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AM NO 44 FAILED Y6 N33 E1
- RULING UPHELD Y35 N4 E1
- AM NO 43 RULED OUT OF ORDER
- AM NO 42 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AM NO 41 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 40 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AM NO 23 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 38 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AM NO 39 FAILED Y11 N28 E1
- AM NO 36 FAILED Y10 N28 E1 A1
- AM NO 29 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 24 FAILED Y11 N26 E1 A2
- AM NO 26 FAILED Y11 N26 E1 A2
- AM NO 35 FAILED Y10 N27 E1 A2
- AM NO 28 FAILED Y11 N26 E1 A2
- AM NO 27 FAILED Y11 N26 E1 A2
- AM NO 30 FAILED Y15 N23 E1 A1
- AM NO 31 FAILED Y11 N27 E1 A1
- AM NO 32 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 33 FAILED Y10 N27 E1 A2
- AM NO 34 NOT OFFERED
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- AM: KOHRING, DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF
- KELLY, DAVIS, FOSTER; NR: MOSES
- DP: THERRIAULT, HANLEY, MARTIN, MULDER,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 1NR 3AM
On January 16, 1998 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor