+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 5DP
- DP: PEARCE, PHILLIPS, PARNELL,
- ADAMS, DONLEY
- (H) FN (ADM)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On May 7, 1998 in the Senate:
- HES REFERRAL WAIVED
On May 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, FIN
On May 5, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 323(FIN)
- PASSED Y37 N1 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- MASEK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N4 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): CROFT, NICHOLIA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 4, 1998 in the House:
- DP: THERRIAULT, KOHRING, GRUSSENDORF,
- MOSES, DAVIS, KELLY; NR: MULDER
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 5/1/98
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- HES RPT CS(HES) NT 4DP 2NR
- DP: BUNDE, PORTER, KEMPLEN, BRICE;
- NR: DYSON, GREEN
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED
On April 24, 1998 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 6DP
- DP: COWDERY, BRICE, RYAN, KUBINA,
- HUDSON, ROKEBERG
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- LABOR & COMMERCE, HES
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 1NR