+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 44 SLA 18
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- 10:06 AM 6/11/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 323
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2018
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 323
On April 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
- FIN RPT 6DP
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- PASSED Y39 A1
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 323
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 323
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- AM: TILTON, THOMPSON, WILSON
- NR: ORTIZ, PRUITT, KAWASAKI
- DP: GUTTENBERG, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 4DP 3NR 3AM
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- DP: STUTES, EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KITO
- L&C RPT 5DP
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor