+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED FAILED Y10 N10
On April 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL ADDED
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS, HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): BROWN, DAVIES, MENARD
- PASSED Y37 N3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 320(HES)
- AMENDMENT NO 1 FAILED Y6 N34
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY MARTIN
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/94
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On April 7, 1994 in the House:
- NR: LARSON, HANLEY, HOFFMAN, THERRIAULT
- FIN RPT CS(HES) 2DP 5NR 1AM
- DP: GRUSSENDORF, BROWN
- AM: MARTIN
- NR: FOSTER
- -PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 3/2/94
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 3/2/94
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- -ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DHSS) 3/2/94
- -FISCAL NOTE (DOE) 3/2/94
- NR: KOTT, VEZEY, BUNDE, OLBERG, NICHOLIA
- DP: BRICE, TOOHEY
- HES RPT CS(HES) 2DP 5NR
On February 9, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): B. DAVIS
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SITTON
- COSPONSOR(S): NORDLUND, OLBERG, PORTER
- COSPONSOR(S): BRICE, BUNDE, FINKELSTEIN
On January 10, 1994 in the House:
- HES, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 3, 1994 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor