+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: JOHNSTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WILSON
- DNP: CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP
- DP: JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 3DP 4DNP 4NR
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: JACKSON, REVAK
- DP: CLAMAN, THOMPSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, HANNAN, DRUMMOND
- CRA RPT 5DP 2NR
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/19