+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 319(JUD) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y38 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 319(JUD) AM
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/12 - ON 4/13 CALENDAR
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/12 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 AS AM ADOPTED Y39 N1
- AM 1 TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y33 N7
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- JUD CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- HELD TO NEXT CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN3: ZERO(CED)
- AM: KOPP
- NR: EASTMAN, STUTES
- DNP: REINBOLD
- DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 2DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- NR: BIRCH, JOHNSON
- DP: TUCK, KNOPP, WOOL, LEDOUX, KREISS-TOMKINS
- STA RPT CS(STA) 5DP 2NR
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (2)
AM 1
AM NO 1 AS AM Y39 N1
AM 1 to AM 1
AM 1 TO AM 1 ADOPTED Y33 N7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor