+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- DP: WILKEN, DYSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B;
- FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- FN5: (DNR)
- NR: GREEN, OLSON
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN5: (DNR)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: OGAN, WAGONER;
- RES RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: SEEKINS, STEVENS B
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 23, 2004 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/23/04
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 319(FIN) AM
- PASSED Y35 N3 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): OGG, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 319(FIN) AM
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- FN3: (DNR)
- FN2: (DNR)
- NR: MEYER, STOLTZE, HARRIS; AM: HAWKER
- DP: CHENAULT, FATE, FOSTER, WILLIAMS;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 3NR 1AM
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On March 9, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: (DNR)
- DAHLSTROM, MASEK
- DP: LYNN, STEPOVICH, WOLF; NR: GATTO,
- RES RPT CS(RES) NT 3DP 3NR
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- FN1: (DNR)
- COGHILL, WEYHRAUCH; AM: BERKOWITZ
- DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN; NR: SEATON, HOLM,
- STA RPT CS(STA) 2DP 4NR 1AM
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- STA, RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS