+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 9, 2010 in the House:
- 2:27 PM 5/6/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 24 SLA 10
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 319(FIN)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, HUGGINS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, MEYER, PASKVAN, ELLIS,
- MENARD, STEDMAN, BUNDE, OLSON, WAGONER, THOMAS, DYSON, STEVENS
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 319(FIN)
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
- NR: OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 5DP
- DP: FRENCH, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, MCGUIRE
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2010
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 319(FIN)
- PASSED Y39 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, P.WILSON, PETERSEN, HERRON, MILLETT, TUCK, KAWASAKI,
- T.WILSON, GARA, GUTTENBERG
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 319(FIN)
On February 19, 2010 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP
- DP: KELLY, THOMAS, DOOGAN, AUSTERMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, HAWKER
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): N.FOSTER, THOMAS, STOLTZE
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR
- DP: LYNN, DAHLSTROM, GATTO, RAMRAS
- NR: GRUENBERG, HERRON
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: (DPS)
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS, LYNN, MUNOZ
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLER
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, HARRIS, KELLY, GATTO
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD, FIN
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor