+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (53)
On July 15, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 1/1/96
- 1:45 PM 6/3/94 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/21 CHAPTER 119 SLA 94
On May 10, 1994 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N- A4
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 319(JUD) AM S
On May 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y11 N9
- THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
On May 6, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NORDLUND
On May 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS (COURT, LAW)
- PREVIOUS FN (DPS)
- FIN RPT 7DP (JUD)SCS
On April 27, 1994 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FNS APPLY (LAW, COURT)
- FN TO SCS PUBLISHED (DPS)
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/94
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 319(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 N1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN
On March 25, 1994 in the House:
- -2 ZERO FISCAL NOTES (COURT, LAW) 3/25
- -FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/25/94
- AM: BROWN
- NR: NAVARRE, THERRIAULT
- NR: HANLEY,MARTIN,PARNELL,GRUSSENDORF
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 2DP 6NR 1AM
On February 24, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GREEN
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 2/23/94
- DP: PHILLIPS, PORTER
- DP: JAMES, KOTT, GREEN, NORDLUND
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) 6DP
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- FIRST COSPONSOR: MACLEAN
On January 19, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MACLEAN
On January 13, 1994 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SANDERS, KOTT
On January 10, 1994 in the House:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On January 3, 1994 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED