+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (51)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 63 SLA 14
- 9:55 AM 7/2/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- FN4: (LWF)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSHB 316(FIN)
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 316(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/22 - ON 4/23 CALENDAR
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/21 - ON 4/22 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2014
On April 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN4: (LWF)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- NR: KELLY, MEYER, OLSON, DUNLEAVY
- DP: HOFFMAN, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH
- FIN RPT 3DP 4NR
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 316(FIN)
- PASSED Y35 E2 A3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- OLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 E2 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: CSHB 316(FIN)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 5NR
- DP: MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GARA
- NR: GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN4: (LWF)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
- FN2: (LWF)
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: HERRON, REINBOLD
- DNP: JOSEPHSON
- DP: SADDLER, OLSON
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 1DNP 2NR
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor