+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 15, 2018 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 316(FIN) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y30 N10
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y37 N3
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 316(FIN)
On April 14, 2018 in the House:
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND PENDING
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y16 N23 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR
- AM NO 1 WITHDRAWN
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- NR: ORTIZ, GRENN
- DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 2NR 5AM
- AM: WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON, PRUITT, THOMPSON
- FN1: ZERO(AJS)
- FN3: (DPS)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- FN2: (DPS)
- FN1: ZERO(AJS)
- AM: EASTMAN
- NR: KOPP, REINBOLD
- DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 2DP 2NR 1AM
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: SPOHNHOLZ
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TARR
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS