+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- RES
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 315(RES)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y38 N1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 315(RES)
On April 15, 2018 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/16 CALENDAR
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2018
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- RES RPT CS(RES) 1DP 8NR
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- DP: DRUMMOND
- NR: BIRCH, PARISH, TALERICO, RAUSCHER, JOHNSON, LINCOLN, TARR, JOSEPHSON
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- AM: EASTMAN
- NR: LEDOUX, MILLETT
- DP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR 1AM
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(DEC)
- JUD, RES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor