+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- 8:30 AM 6/6/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/6 CHAPTER 51 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/03
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 E3 A2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): BERKOWITZ
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y16 N3 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HB 313 AM S
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 313
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y17 N2 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- BILL NOT TAKEN UP 5/17-ON 5/18 CALENDAR
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: BUNDE, SEEKINS;
- NR: FRENCH, STEVENS G
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 4DP 5NR
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, FOSTER, WILLIAMS;
- NR: STOLTZE, KERTTULA, BERKOWITZ,
- MOSES, CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2003
- MOVED TO TOP OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 313
- PASSED Y34 E3 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 E3 A4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): KOTT, LYNN
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 313
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN