+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On October 2, 2020 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:30 P.M. 5/20/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/21 CHAPTER 32 SLA 20
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- AM NO 3 OFFERED
- RLS RPT 5DP
- DP: COGHILL, BEGICH, GIESSEL, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF
- FN1: ZERO(H.RLS/VARIOUS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/20/2020
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- AM NO 1 RULED OUT OF ORDER, RULE 41(B)
- RULING CHALLENGED AND UPHELD Y11 N9
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y1 N19
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 3 RULED OUT OF ORDER, CONSTITUTION ART II SEC 13
- PASSED Y19 N1
- RULING CHALLENGED AND UPHELD Y14 N6
- VERSION: HB 313
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 313
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULING CHALLENGED AND UPHELD Y14 N6
- AM NO 4 RULED OUT OF ORDER, CONSTITUTION ART II SEC 13
- AM NO 4 OFFERED
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RLS RPT 7DP
- DP: JOHNSON, THOMPSON, JOHNSTON, EDGMON, STUTES, PRUITT, KOPP
- FN1: ZERO(H.RLS/VARIOUS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 313
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y39 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 313
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- RLS
- RLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor