+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 312(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, PETERSEN, SEATON, KERTTULA
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y38 E2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 312(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2012
On April 6, 2012 in the House:
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, JOULE, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN, GUTTENBERG, STOLTZE,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, GARA
- THOMAS
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON, EDGMON, AUSTERMAN, HOLMES, DOOGAN
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- AM: CISSNA
- DP: DICK, AUSTERMAN, FOSTER, SADDLER, GARDNER, MUNOZ
- CRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 6DP 1AM
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- CRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor