+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 1DP 3NR
- DP: DYSON
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, GIESSEL
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 310(STA)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y23 N14 E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 310(STA) AM
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/4 CALENDAR
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 5DP
- DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, HUGHES, LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, GATTIS, ISAACSON, KELLER
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA