+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On September 25, 2012 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/23/12
- 4:03 PM 5/10/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 24 SLA 12
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- FN2: (DHS)
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12
On April 14, 2012 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 310(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 310(FIN)
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN2: (DHS)
- DP: DAVIS, MEYER, EGAN, DYSON
- HSS RPT 4DP
On April 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- MEYER, STEDMAN, STEVENS, ELLIS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, DYSON, MCGUIRE, DAVIS, PASKVAN, EGAN, THOMAS, MENARD,
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2012
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSHB 310(FIN)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 310(FIN)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, MILLETT, PRUITT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- PASSED Y37 E3
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- NR: T.WILSON, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 4NR 2AM
- DP: COSTELLO, GUTTENBERG, GARA, EDGMON
- AM: FAIRCLOUGH, NEUMAN
- FN2: (DHS)
- COSPONSOR(S): DOOGAN, GARA
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: (DHS)
- NR: KELLER
- DP: KERTTULA, DICK, SEATON, MILLER, HERRON
- HSS RPT CS(HSS) 5DP 1NR
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- HSS, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor