+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- AM: VANCE
- NR: STORY, TARR, CLAMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS
- DP: KAUFMAN, EASTMAN
- STA RPT 2DP 4NR 1AM
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): VANCE
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS, MCCARTY
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor