+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
On September 7, 2004 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 11:11AM 6/29/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 148 SLA 04
On May 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- VERSION: HB 31
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- GREEN, OGAN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WAGONER, STEVENS G,
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y14 N6
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 31
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2004
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/8 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- COWDERY, BUNDE, WILKEN, STEDMAN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, SEEKINS,
- FN2: ZERO(GOV)
- OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, DYSON, HOFFMAN
- FIN RPT 7DP
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(GOV)
- NR: FRENCH
- DP: SEEKINS, THERRIAULT, OGAN
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y27 N11 E1 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 31
- VERSION: HB 31
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- HELD TO 2/5 CALENDAR
On February 2, 2004 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MORGAN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/4 CALENDAR
- FN2: ZERO(GOV)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/2/04
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- DP: SAMUELS, OGG, ANDERSON, MCGUIRE;
- DNP: GARA; NR: HOLM
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- GRUENBERG, LYNN, DAHLSTROM
- DP: HOLM, WEYHRAUCH; NR: SEATON,
- STA RPT 2DP 4NR
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED (1/10/03)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor