+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, LYNN
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- REFERRED TO RULES
- FN2: ZERO(EED)
- AM: GUTTENBERG
- NR: GARA, MUNOZ, EDGMON, T.WILSON, NEUMAN, STOLTZE
- DP: COSTELLO, THOMPSON
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 2DP 6NR 1AM
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- DP: REINBOLD, P.WILSON, LEDOUX, SADDLER, GATTIS
- EDC RPT 5DP 2NR
- COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
- NR: SEATON, DRUMMOND
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13