+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- 9:39 AM 7/14/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/14 CHAPTER 82 SLA 14
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/12/14
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 309(L&C)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, MCGUIRE, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, MICCICHE, STEDMAN
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 309(L&C)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT 2DP 1NR
- DP: DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE
- NR: OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 309(L&C)
- PASSED Y30 N4 E3 A3
- TUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y29 N5 E3 A3
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 309(L&C)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2014
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HELD TO 4/11 CALENDAR
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 4NR
- DP: MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, OLSON
- NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, REINBOLD, SADDLER
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, GATTIS
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor