+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 1/1/97
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 75 SLA 96
- MANIFEST ERROR
- 1:25 PM 6/7/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 WITHDRAWN
On April 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 1 OFFERED BY DONLEY
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- HELD W/PENDING AMENDMENT TO 4/23 CAL
On April 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- DONLEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y16 N3 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 308(JUD)
On April 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR & 1NR 4/18/96
On April 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS H ZERO FN (LAW)
- JUD RPT 1DP 2NR
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- COSPONSOR(S): THERRIAULT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y34 E6
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 308(JUD)
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/07/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N28 E6
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/9 CALENDAR
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAW)
- NR: GREEN, VEZEY
- B.DAVIS
- DP: PORTER, BUNDE, TOOHEY, FINKELSTEIN,
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 2NR
On April 13, 1995 in the House:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor