+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/25 CHAPTER 4 SLA 20
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On March 24, 2020 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 5:33 P.M. 3/24/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 E3
- CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
On March 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UC
- DP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, BISHOP
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(LWF)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SCS HB 308(FIN)
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 308(FIN)
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RLS RPT 7DP
- DP: JOHNSON, THOMPSON, EDGMON, STUTES, PRUITT, JOHNSTON, KOPP
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(LWF)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2020
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 308
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- PASSED Y38 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 308 AM
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- RLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) UC
- RLS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE LABOR & COMMERCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor