+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/16
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/1 CHAPTER 31 SLA 16
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- 1:43 PM 6/15/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD RPT 4DP
- DP: MCGUIRE, COGHILL, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 308 AM
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, MCGUIRE
- PASSED Y19 N1
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: HB 308 AM
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2016 in the House:
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, WOOL, JOSEPHSON
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HB 308 AM
- PASSED Y39 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: HB 308 AM
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: MILLETT, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN, KELLER, CLAMAN, LEDOUX
- JUD RPT 6DP
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: JOSEPHSON, KITO
- DP: HUGHES, TILTON, OLSON
- L&C RPT 3DP 2NR
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- L&C, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS