+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (75)
On June 22, 2008 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/14/08
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 96 SLA 08
On June 6, 2008 in the House:
- 10:36 AM 6/5/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 30, 2008 in the House:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE, ELTON, ELLIS, DYSON, BUNDE, THOMAS,
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2008
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- HELD IN SECOND READING
- MOVED AFTER 1ST SUPP CAL
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 307(JUD) AM S
- AM NO 1 (TITLE AM) ADOPTED Y17 N3
- WAGONER, FRENCH, DAVIS
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- PASSED Y20 N-
On April 11, 2008 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 307(JUD) AM S
On April 11, 2008 in the House:
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y22 N8 E1 A9
On April 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- MCGUIRE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 23
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN13: (CRT)
- FN12: ZERO(S.FIN/ADM)
- FN11: ZERO(S.FIN/ADM)
- FN10: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- DP: STEDMAN, ELTON, THOMAS, HUGGINS, OLSON
- FIN RPT SCS(JUD) 5DP
On April 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- JUD RPT SCS 3DP NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 23
- DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE
- FN6: (ADM)
- FN8: (CRT)
- FN9: (LAW)
- FN7: (COR)
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2008
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y36 N1 E3
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 307(FIN)
- COSPONSOR(S): WILSON, GRUENBERG, GUTTENBERG, ROSES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 307(FIN)
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 5NR 1AM
- DP: GARA, NELSON
- NR: CRAWFORD, JOULE, THOMAS, STOLTZE, MEYER
- AM: HAWKER
- FN5: (ADM)
- FN4: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: (COR)
- FN8: (CRT)
- FN9: (LAW)
- FN6: (ADM)
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): NELSON
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON, CRAWFORD, DOOGAN, GARDNER, OLSON, GATTO, KERTTULA, LEDOUX
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- AM: COGHILL
- JUD RPT 5DP 1AM
- DP: DOOGAN, DAHLSTROM, SAMUELS, HOLMES, RAMRAS
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(COR)
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS, SAMUELS
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): SALMON
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/08
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (36)
HOLMES
Type:
Primary Sponsor