+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 21, 1996 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 10/1/96
- 1:30 PM 6/21/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/3 CHAPTER 135 SLA 96
On May 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 306(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/96
On May 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN (DNR)
- JUD RPT 1DP 4NR
On May 1, 1995 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/01/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): BRICE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 306(JUD)
- PASSED Y40
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
On May 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUDICIARY
On April 28, 1995 in the House:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DNR)
- NR: FINKELSTEIN, BUNDE
- DP: PORTER, B.DAVIS, GREEN, TOOHEY
- JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 2NR
On April 26, 1995 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): B.DAVIS
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)