+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 3:05 PM 6/13/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 30 SLA 18
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 306(FIN)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2018
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 306(FIN)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: BISHOP, STEVENS, MICCICHE
- FIN RPT 3DP 1NR
On April 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 306(FIN)
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 306(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 N1 A1
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: WILSON, KAWASAKI, GRENN, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, TILTON
- DP: GUTTENBERG, GARA
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 2DP 7NR
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL, BIRCH, KITO
- L&C RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DNP: KNOPP
- NR: JOSEPHSON
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- L&C, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HOUSE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor