+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (85)
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
On September 19, 2014 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/7 CHAPTER 61 SLA 14
- FN6: (LEG)
- FN7: (REV)
- 9:55 AM 7/2/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y15 N3 E1 A1
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y11 N7 E1 A1
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y4 N14 E1 A1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 306(FIN) AM S
- EGAN, GIESSEL, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, STEVENS, DYSON, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, MCGUIRE, BISHOP,
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: MILLETT
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 E2 A5
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
- CONCUR MESSAGE
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 306(FIN) AM S
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/22 - ON 4/23 CALENDAR
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/21 - ON 4/22 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2014
On April 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FIN RPT SCS 3DP 1NR 3AM NEW TITLE
- TITLE CHANGE: SCR 30
- DP: MEYER, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH
- AM: BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, OLSON
- NR: HOFFMAN
- FN2: ZERO(DEC)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(CED)
- FN6: (LEG)
- FN7: (REV)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(LWF)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N24 A3
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y11 N26 A3
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y39 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 306(FIN)
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: LEDOUX
- COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 306(FIN)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 N1 A1
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 2NR 2AM
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- DP: NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- NR: HOLMES, COSTELLO
- AM: MUNOZ, GARA
- FN6: (LEG)
- FN2: ZERO(DEC)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(LWF)
- FN4: ZERO(DNR)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(CED)
- FN7: (REV)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, CHENAULT, LEDOUX, HAWKER, KELLER, T.WILSON
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor