+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- WITHDRAWN BY SPONSOR
On May 2, 2006 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2006
On April 28, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: JOULE, HAWKER, KELLY, STOLTZE, MEYER, CHENAULT
- DNP: KERTTULA;
- DP: FOSTER;
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) 1DP 1DNP 6NR
On April 21, 2006 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: OLSON, GATTO, SAMUELS
- DP: CRAWFORD, RAMRAS;
- RES RPT CS(RES) 2DP 3NR
On May 7, 2005 in the House:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor