+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 18, 2016 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/16
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 21 SLA 16
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- 3:49 PM 6/1/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2016
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 305(EDC)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSHB 305(EDC)
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER, STEVENS
- L&C RPT 4DP
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2016
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- EDC CS ADOPTED UC
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 305(EDC)
- PASSED Y38 E2
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, DRUMMOND, MILLETT, SEATON
- VERSION: CSHB 305(EDC)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): TILTON
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): KITO
- FN1: ZERO(EED)
- NR: DRUMMOND
- DP: TALERICO, SEATON, COLVER, SPOHNHOLZ, KELLER
- EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 5DP 1NR
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- EDC
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor