+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On August 14, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/27 CHAPTER 89 SLA 02
On June 21, 2002 in the House:
- 9:59 AM 6/17/02 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 14, 2002 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y28 N3 E1 A8
On May 13, 2002 in the House:
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On May 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 305(RLS)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LEMAN, TAYLOR,
- RULES TO CAL W/SCS 1OR 5/11 SAME TITLE
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED Y20 N-
- PHILLIPS, STEVENS, HALFORD, WILKEN
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 305(RLS)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- DONLEY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: THERRIAULT; DP: PHILLIPS, STEVENS
- STA RPT SCS 2DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On March 22, 2002 in the House:
- VERSION: CSHB 305(STA) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y35 E3 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 305(STA) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/02
On March 15, 2002 in the House:
- STA RPT CS(STA) 5DP 2NR
- COGHILL; NR: CRAWFORD, STEVENS
- DP: WILSON, JAMES, FATE, HAYES,
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DNP: MASEK
- DP: KOTT, GREEN, MURKOWSKI, CHENAULT;
- MLV RPT 4DP 1DNP
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): GUESS
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/4/02
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor