+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (67)
On June 22, 2008 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/08
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 106 SLA 08
On June 6, 2008 in the House:
- 3:11 PM 6/4/08 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E1 A1
- HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCS CSHB 305(JUD)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y17 N3
- READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 305(JUD)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2008
- STA SCS RECEIVED SAME TITLE
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- STA RPT SCS FORTHCOMING 1DP 3NR
- NR: MCGUIRE, FRENCH, STEVENS
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- DP: BUNDE
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: THERRIAULT, HUGGINS
- DP: FRENCH, MCGUIRE
- JUD RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR REMOVED: LYNN
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- JUD REFERRAL ADDED BEFORE STA
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y18 N20 E1 A1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM TO AM 2 ADOPTED UNANIMOUS CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- VERSION: CSHB 305(RLS) AM
- AM NO 2 AS AM ADOPTED Y35 N3 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N3 E1 A1
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): ROSES, LYNN, STOLTZE
- GUTTENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y31 N3 E5 A1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- RESCIND ADOPT CS(RLS) FAILED Y12 N22 E5 A1
- RET 2ND/RESCIND ADOPT CS(RLS) Y33 N1 E5 A1
- LEDOUX ABSTAIN VOTE FLD Y18 N17 E5 PER UR 34(B)
- MOVED RETURN TO SECOND/RESCIND ACTION
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 305(RLS)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/13/2008
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/19 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- AM: GUTTENBERG, JOHNSON
- DP: FAIRCLOUGH, HARRIS, KERTTULA, SAMUELS, COGHILL
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 5DP 2AM
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: COGHILL, DOLL
- DP: JOHNSON, JOHANSEN, ROSES, LYNN
- STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 2NR
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/08
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor