+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH HOUSE BILL
On May 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
On May 2, 2002 in the House:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N32 E1
- RLS RPT CS(2D RLS) NT 1DP 1DNP 5NR
- DP: PORTER; DNP: KOHRING; NR: JOULE,
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH RLS REPORT
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/02
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- 2D RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- DIVIDE AM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N26 E1
- MORGAN, MCQUIRE, KOTT, BERKOWITZ
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y22 N17 E1
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y30 N9 E1
- VERSION: CSHB 304(2D RLS) AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (S)
- ADOPTED RLS LETTER OF INTENT UC
- COSPONSOR(S): DAVIES
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- ROKEBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- ADOPTED RLS LETTER OF INTENT UC
- PASSED Y28 N11 E1
- READ THIRD TIME CSHB 304(2D RLS) AM
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On April 18, 2002 in the House:
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- FN2: ZERO(REV) CORRECTED DESIGNATION
- BERKOWITZ; NR: MCGUIRE
- DP: KOTT, PORTER; DNP: KOHRING,
- RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 2DP 2DNP 1NR
On March 27, 2002 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/02
- FN2: (REV)
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
On March 26, 2002 in the House:
- FN(S): FORTHCOMING
- MOSES; AM: CROFT, DAVIES, WILLIAMS
- MULDER; DNP: FOSTER; NR: HARRIS,
- DP: BUNDE, WHITAKER, LANCASTER, HUDSON,
- FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 1DNP 2NR 3AM
On March 22, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): MULDER
On March 19, 2002 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: HAYES, COGHILL; AM: CRAWFORD
- DP: FATE, WILSON, STEVENS; DNP: JAMES;
- STA RPT 3DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- COSPONSOR(S): FATE
On January 14, 2002 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/4/02